TX HB2724 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Culture, Recreation & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Culture, Recreation & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the removal and disposal of abandoned fishing devices and the seizure and disposition of unlawful fishing devices.
Title
Relating to the removal and disposal of abandoned fishing devices and the seizure and disposition of unlawful fishing devices.
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Krause [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-12 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-12 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism |
2021-03-17 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB599 (Same As) 2021-05-15 - Effective on 9/1/21
Subjects
Parks & Wildlife
PARKS & WILDLIFE COMMISSION
PARKS & WILDLIFE DEPARTMENT
Parks & Wildlife--Hunting & Fishing
PARKS & WILDLIFE COMMISSION
PARKS & WILDLIFE DEPARTMENT
Parks & Wildlife--Hunting & Fishing