TX HB2719 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-15 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Status: Introduced on March 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-15 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Summary
Relating to a limited waiver of sovereign immunity for state and local governmental entities in certain employment lawsuits filed by nurses.
Title
Relating to a limited waiver of sovereign immunity for state and local governmental entities in certain employment lawsuits filed by nurses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-15 | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. | |
2009-05-15 | Withdrawn from calendar | |
2009-05-15 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-13 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-11 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-08 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-08 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-06 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-06 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-05-06 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-22 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-22 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-22 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-17 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | |
2009-03-17 | Read first time | |
2009-03-06 | Filed |
Subjects
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Hospitals
NURSES & NURSE AIDES
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
Hospitals
NURSES & NURSE AIDES
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations