TX HB2711 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred to Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred to Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the continuation of a residence homestead exemption from ad valorem taxation while the owner is temporarily absent because of service outside of the United States as a foreign service officer employed by the United States Department of State.
Title
Relating to the continuation of a residence homestead exemption from ad valorem taxation while the owner is temporarily absent because of service outside of the United States as a foreign service officer employed by the United States Department of State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-13 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1058 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-13 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-13 | House | Record vote RV#1058 |
2021-05-13 | House | Passed |
2021-05-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-12 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-05-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-10 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-30 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-21 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-21 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-19 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-19 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2021-03-17 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-03 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Property Interests--Homestead
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions