TX HB2710 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-26 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-26 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Summary
Relating to indigent health care services that may be provided by a county.
Title
Relating to indigent health care services that may be provided by a county.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-26 | Removed from local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-26 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-26 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-20 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-20 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-20 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-19 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-19 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-06 | Referred to Health & Human Services | |
2009-05-06 | Read first time | |
2009-05-01 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-01 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-30 | Record vote | |
2009-04-30 | Passed | |
2009-04-30 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-30 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-30 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-04-28 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-04-24 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-04-23 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-23 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-09 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-09 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-04-09 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-09 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-30 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-30 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-30 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-30 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-17 | Referred to County Affairs | |
2009-03-17 | Read first time | |
2009-03-06 | Filed |