TX HB27 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 4 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-08-07 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the development of brackish groundwater.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the development of brackish groundwater.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-08-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#59 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-08-03 - House - Read 2nd time RV#52 (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-07SenateReceived from the House
2017-08-04HouseReported engrossed
2017-08-04HouseRecord vote
2017-08-04HousePassed
2017-08-04HouseRead 3rd time
2017-08-03HouseRecord vote
2017-08-03HousePassed to engrossment
2017-08-03HouseRead 2nd time
2017-08-03HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-08-01HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-07-31HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-07-31HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-07-28HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-07-26HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-07-26HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-07-26HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-07-26HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-07-20HouseReferred to Natural Resources
2017-07-20HouseRead first time
2017-07-19HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback