TX HB2677 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the name of the statewide alert system for certain missing adults.
Title
Relating to the name of the statewide alert system for certain missing adults.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - Read 3rd time RV#91 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - Read 3rd time RV#91 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-15 | Effective immediately | |
2021-05-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-05-04 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-03 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-04-30 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-04-29 | House | Senate passage reported |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-07 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-07 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-07 | House | Record vote RV#91 |
2021-04-07 | House | Passed |
2021-04-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-06 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-04-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-06 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-01 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-03-30 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-03-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-03-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-03-25 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-03-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2021-03-17 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1462 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Referred to Transportation
Subjects
ALERT SYSTEM
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Law Enforcement
MISSING PERSONS
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Law Enforcement
MISSING PERSONS