TX HB2668 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-03 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-03 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the rights of victims of sexual assault and to certain procedures and reimbursements occurring with respect to a sexual assault or other sex offense.
Title
Relating to the rights of victims of sexual assault and to certain procedures and reimbursements occurring with respect to a sexual assault or other sex offense.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2023-05-03 | House | Companion considered in lieu of SB 1401 |
2023-05-02 | House | Postponed 5/3/23 9:00 AM |
2023-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-02 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-04-28 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-28 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-27 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-13 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-04-13 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-13 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2023-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
CRIME VICTIMS
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Electronic Information Systems
EVIDENCE
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
FORENSIC TESTING
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Law Enforcement
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
SEXUAL ASSAULT
CRIME VICTIMS
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Electronic Information Systems
EVIDENCE
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
FORENSIC TESTING
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Law Enforcement
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
SEXUAL ASSAULT