TX HB2666 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Withdrawn from schedule
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Withdrawn from schedule
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the sales and use tax exemption for certain aircraft.
Title
Relating to the sales and use tax exemption for certain aircraft.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Withdrawn from schedule |
2019-04-24 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2019-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1214 (Same As) 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2666 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02666I.htm |