TX HB2647 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to authorized investments of public funds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to authorized investments of public funds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#322 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Effective immediately
2017-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-25SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-24HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-23HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-20HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-19SenateRecord vote
2017-05-19SenatePassed
2017-05-19SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-19SenateRecord vote
2017-05-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-19SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-18SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-05-17SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-15SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-15SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-15SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-11SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-04SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-05-04SenateRead first time
2017-04-24SenateReceived from the House
2017-04-20HouseReported engrossed
2017-04-20HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-04-20HouseRecord vote
2017-04-20HousePassed
2017-04-20HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-20HousePassed to engrossment
2017-04-20HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-19HouseRules suspended
2017-04-21HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2017-04-17HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2017-04-11HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-04-11HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-10HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-04HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-04HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-04-04HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-04HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-28HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-28HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-28HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-03-28HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-28HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-21HouseReferred to Investments & Financial Services
2017-03-21HouseRead first time
2017-03-01HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback