TX HB2644 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-17 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Homeland Security & Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-17 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Homeland Security & Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the notification of a peace officer through an indication associated with vehicle registration that a person has a health condition that may impede communication.
Title
Relating to the notification of a peace officer through an indication associated with vehicle registration that a person has a health condition that may impede communication.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2019-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB976 (Same As) 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
Disabilities, Persons with
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
PEACE OFFICERS
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
PEACE OFFICERS
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2644 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02644I.htm |