TX HB2640 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Summary
Relating to the regulation of motor vehicle manufacturers and distributors.
Title
Relating to the regulation of motor vehicle manufacturers and distributors.
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Smith [R] | Sen. Kirk Watson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective on 9/1/09 | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-25 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-24 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-23 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-21 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported | |
2009-05-20 | Text of Senate Amendment(s) | |
2009-05-20 | Record vote | |
2009-05-20 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) | |
2009-05-19 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2009-05-19 | Senate Amendments printed and distributed | |
2009-05-18 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-18 | Record vote | |
2009-05-18 | Passed | |
2009-05-18 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-18 | Record vote | |
2009-05-18 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-18 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-18 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2009-05-18 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-18 | Amended | |
2009-05-18 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-18 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-18 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-15 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-14 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-14 | Reported favorably as amended | |
2009-05-13 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-11 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-11 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-11 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-11 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-04 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | |
2009-05-04 | Read first time | |
2009-05-01 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-01 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-30 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-30 | Record vote | |
2009-04-30 | Passed | |
2009-04-30 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-30 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-30 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-30 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-04-28 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-04-28 | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. | |
2009-04-28 | Withdrawn from calendar | |
2009-04-28 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-04-24 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-04-20 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-04-17 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-17 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-09 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-09 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-04-09 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-09 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-01 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-01 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-01 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-01 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-16 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | |
2009-03-16 | Read first time | |
2009-03-06 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1758 (Same As) 2009-03-20 - Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Business & Commerce--General
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General