TX HB2636 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-08 - Placed on General State Calendar
Status: Introduced on March 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-08 - Placed on General State Calendar
Summary
Relating to the establishment of an employment services program to assist certain unemployed or underemployed child support obligors.
Title
Relating to the establishment of an employment services program to assist certain unemployed or underemployed child support obligors.
Sponsors
Sen. Carol Alvarado [D] | Rep. Joaquin Castro [D] | Rep. Veronica Gonzales [D] | Rep. Solomon Ortiz [D] |
Rep. Mike Villarreal [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-08 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-06 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-28 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-27 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-27 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-22 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-22 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-14 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-14 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-14 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-14 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-16 | Referred to Technology, Economic Development & Workforce | |
2009-03-16 | Read first time | |
2009-03-06 | Filed |
Subjects
Family
Family--Child Support
Labor
Labor--Unemployment
Labor--Workforce Development
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS
Family--Child Support
Labor
Labor--Unemployment
Labor--Workforce Development
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS