TX HB2614 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-06 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Status: Introduced on March 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-06 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Summary
Relating to a county's general revenue levy for indigent health care.
Title
Relating to a county's general revenue levy for indigent health care.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Heflin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-06 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-01 | Transferred to Calendars Committee | |
2009-05-01 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-04-28 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-04-27 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-27 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-20 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-20 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-04-20 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-20 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-16 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-16 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-16 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-16 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-16 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-12 | Referred to County Affairs | |
2009-03-12 | Read first time | |
2009-03-05 | Filed |