TX HB2588 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to access to criminal history record information by the Railroad Commission of Texas.
Title
Relating to access to criminal history record information by the Railroad Commission of Texas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Read 3rd time RV#494 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Read 3rd time RV#494 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-09 | Effective immediately | |
2017-06-09 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate passage reported |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-27 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-27 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-27 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-27 | House | Passed |
2017-04-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-27 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-27 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-04-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-27 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-04-24 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-04-19 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-04-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-10 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-10 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-10 | House | Withdrawn from schedule |
2017-04-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to Energy Resources |
2017-03-27 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-28 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
CRIMINAL RECORDS
Labor
Labor--General
Mines & Mineral Resources
Oil & Gas
RAILROAD COMMISSION
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Utilities
Utilities--Natural Gas
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
CRIMINAL RECORDS
Labor
Labor--General
Mines & Mineral Resources
Oil & Gas
RAILROAD COMMISSION
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Utilities
Utilities--Natural Gas