TX HB2575 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-25 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House County Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-25 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House County Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the duty of a county to refund an amount of $5 or less paid to the county clerk.
Title
Relating to the duty of a county to refund an amount of $5 or less paid to the county clerk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-24 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2019-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-27 | House | Filed |
Subjects
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
County Government--Finance
County Government--General
County Government--Employees/Officers
County Government--Finance
County Government--General
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2575 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02575I.htm |