TX HB2536 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-4)
Status: Passed on May 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to neglect of a child and the grounds for termination of the parent-child relationship and possession of a child by the Department of Family and Protective Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to neglect of a child and the grounds for termination of the parent-child relationship and possession of a child by the Department of Family and Protective Services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - Read 3rd time RV#175 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - Read 2nd time RV#154 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-15 Effective immediately
2021-05-15 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-04 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-03SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-03HouseSigned in the House
2021-04-30HouseReported enrolled
2021-04-29HouseSenate passage reported
2021-04-29SenateRecord vote
2021-04-29SenatePassed
2021-04-29SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-29SenateRecord vote
2021-04-29SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-29SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-29SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-04-29SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-04-29SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-26SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-21SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-21SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-21SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-04-20SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-04-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-19SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-04-19SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-13SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-04-13SenateRead first time
2021-04-13SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-13HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-13HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-13HouseRecord vote RV#175
2021-04-13HousePassed
2021-04-13HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-12HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-12HouseRecord vote RV#154
2021-04-12HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-12HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-12HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-09HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-06HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-06HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-06HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-01HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-01HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-03-29HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-29HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-29HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-29HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-17HouseReferred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
2021-03-17HouseRead first time
2021-03-01HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB2015 (Same As) 2021-04-01 - Referred to State Affairs

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2536
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02536I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02536H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02536E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02536S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02536F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02536I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02536H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02536E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02536E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2536&RcdVtNo=154&Ch=H&Dt=04/12/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2536&RcdVtNo=175&Ch=H&Dt=04/13/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-29-F.PDF#page=4

Bill Comments 750

feedback