TX HB2528 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-15 - Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Pending: House Juvenile Justice & Family Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-15 - Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Pending: House Juvenile Justice & Family Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the contracting authority of the Health and Human Services Commission for the volunteer advocate for children program.
Title
Relating to the contracting authority of the Health and Human Services Commission for the volunteer advocate for children program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-15 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-12 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-12 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-12 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues |
2021-03-17 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1156 (Similar To) 2021-05-24 - Effective immediately
Subjects
Family
Family--Child Protection
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Child Services
Family--Child Protection
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Child Services