TX SB1156 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the contracting authority of the Health and Human Services Commission for the volunteer advocate for children program.
Title
Relating to the contracting authority of the Health and Human Services Commission for the volunteer advocate for children program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-08 - House - Read 3rd time RV#898 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | Effective immediately | |
2021-05-24 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-05-12 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-12 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-10 | Senate | House passage reported |
2021-05-08 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-08 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-08 | House | Record vote RV#898 |
2021-05-08 | House | Passed |
2021-05-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-08 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-08 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-08 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-05-04 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-04-27 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-04-27 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-15 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-14 | House | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues |
2021-04-14 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-12 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Meeting cancelled |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2528 (Similar To) 2021-04-15 - Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Subjects
Family
Family--Child Protection
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Child Services
Family--Child Protection
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Child Services