TX HB2525 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the regulation of physician assistants and anesthesiologist assistants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the regulation of physician assistants and anesthesiologist assistants.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-02HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-02HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-01HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-24HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-24HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-24HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-10HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-10HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-10HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-10HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-10HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-03HouseNo action taken in committee
2017-04-03HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-27HouseReferred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
2017-03-27HouseRead first time
2017-02-28HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback