TX HB2519 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to matters regarding educators, including the composition of the State Board for Educator Certification, the issuance of certain sanctions by the board, and requiring a school district to notify a teacher regarding the submission of certain complaints to the board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to matters regarding educators, including the composition of the State Board for Educator Certification, the issuance of certain sanctions by the board, and requiring a school district to notify a teacher regarding the submission of certain complaints to the board.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-28 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1652 (Y: 133 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#376 (Y: 143 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-18 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-18 Signed by the Governor
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-30HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-28SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-28HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2021-05-28HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-28HouseRecord vote RV#1652
2021-05-28HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2021-05-27HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2021-05-27HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2021-05-27HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2021-05-27SenateRecord vote
2021-05-27SenatePassed
2021-05-27SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-27SenateRecord vote
2021-05-27SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-27SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-27SenateAmended
2021-05-27SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Zaffirini
2021-05-27SenateRead 2nd time
2021-05-27SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-26SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-25SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-25SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-24SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-18SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-05-18SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-17SenatePosting rule suspended
2021-05-04SenateReferred to Education
2021-05-04SenateRead first time
2021-04-21SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-21HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-21HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-21HouseRecord vote RV#376
2021-04-21HousePassed
2021-04-21HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-20HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-20HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-15HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-09HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-09HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-30HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-30HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-30HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-23HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-23HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-23HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-23HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-17HouseReferred to Public Education
2021-03-17HouseRead first time
2021-03-01HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1238 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - Referred to Education

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2519
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02519I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02519H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02519E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02519S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02519F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB02519S2F1.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02519I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02519H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02519H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02519E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02519E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02519S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02519S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02519F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2519&RcdVtNo=376&Ch=H&Dt=04/21/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2519&RcdVtNo=1652&Ch=H&Dt=05/28/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-26-F.PDF#page=225

Bill Comments

feedback