TX HB2511 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-16 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-16 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the option of providing electronic recordings of proceedings in the municipal court of record for the City of Houston.
Title
Relating to the option of providing electronic recordings of proceedings in the municipal court of record for the City of Houston.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-08 - House - HB 2511Third Reading House (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-05-08 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-08 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-08 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-08 | House | Passed |
2013-05-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-08 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2013-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-08 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2013-05-07 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-05-06 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-29 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-04-29 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-04-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-15 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-12 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2013-03-12 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-05 | House | Filed |