TX HB2510 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-14 - Left pending in subcommittee
Status: Introduced on March 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-14 - Left pending in subcommittee
Summary
Relating to the admissibility of a statement made by an accused in a criminal case.
Title
Relating to the admissibility of a statement made by an accused in a criminal case.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-14 | Left pending in subcommittee | |
2009-04-14 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | |
2009-04-14 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | |
2009-04-14 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-17 | Subcommittee members named | |
2009-03-17 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | |
2009-03-11 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2009-03-11 | Read first time | |
2009-03-05 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2036 (Same As) 2009-03-31 - Referred to Criminal Justice