TX HB2496 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-10 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-10 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to notice provided by certain public water systems regarding a water service interruption in an area served by a fire department that provides fire suppression services.
Title
Relating to notice provided by certain public water systems regarding a water service interruption in an area served by a fire department that provides fire suppression services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-10 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-09 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-05-03 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-05-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-05-03 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-13 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2023-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-17 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Utilities
Utilities--Water & Sewer
WATER
Water--General
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Utilities
Utilities--Water & Sewer
WATER
Water--General