TX HB2481 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-15 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation and administration of certain specialty court programs; authorizing fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation and administration of certain specialty court programs; authorizing fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1750 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-19 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#876 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-15 Vetoed by the Governor
2019-05-29 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-25HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-23SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-23HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2019-05-23HouseRecord vote RV#1750
2019-05-23HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2019-05-21HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-21HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-20HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-19SenateRecord vote
2019-05-19SenatePassed as amended
2019-05-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-19SenateAmended
2019-05-19SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Creighton
2019-05-19SenateVote reconsidered
2019-05-19SenateRecord vote
2019-05-19SenatePassed
2019-05-19SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-19SenateRecord vote
2019-05-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-19SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-19SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-19SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-15SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-15SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-15SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-07SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2019-05-07SenateRead first time
2019-05-02SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-02HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-02HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-02HouseRecord vote RV#876
2019-05-02HousePassed
2019-05-02HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-01HousePassed to engrossment
2019-05-01HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-29HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-25HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-17HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-16HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-16HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-11HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-11HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-11HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-11HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-11HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-11HouseReferred to Corrections
2019-03-11HouseRead first time
2019-02-26HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2481
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02481I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02481H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02481E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02481S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB02481F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2481&RcdVtNo=876&Ch=H&Dt=05/02/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-19-F.PDF#page=41
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-19-F.PDF#page=52
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB2481&RcdVtNo=1750&Ch=H&Dt=05/23/2019

Bill Comments

feedback