TX HB2439 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-06 - Laid on the table subject to call
Status: Introduced on March 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-06 - Laid on the table subject to call
Summary
Relating to compensation for the use of the public transportation system of a regional transportation authority.
Title
Relating to compensation for the use of the public transportation system of a regional transportation authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-06 | Laid on the table subject to call | |
2009-05-06 | Companion considered in lieu of | |
2009-04-29 | Postponed | |
2009-04-29 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-04-27 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-16 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-15 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-15 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-07 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-07 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-07 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-11 | Referred to Transportation | |
2009-03-11 | Read first time | |
2009-03-04 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB405 (Same As) 2009-05-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Subjects
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Transportation
Transportation--Mass Transit
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Transportation
Transportation--Mass Transit