TX HB2436 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the sale of bonds by certain special purpose districts.
Title
Relating to the sale of bonds by certain special purpose districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-11 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-09 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-05-09 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-05-03 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-05-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-05-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-19 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-19 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-13 | House | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services |
2023-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-16 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2206 (Same As) 2023-03-22 - Referred to Local Government
SB2206 (Same As) 2023-03-22 - Referred to Local Government
SB2206 (Same As) 2023-03-22 - Referred to Local Government
Subjects
BONDS
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD, TEXAS
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD, TEXAS