TX HB2436 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-04 - Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-04 - Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
Summary
Relating to the zoning authority of counties around certain bodies of water.
Title
Relating to the zoning authority of counties around certain bodies of water.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-04 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | |
2009-05-04 | Read first time | |
2009-04-29 | Received from the House | |
2009-04-28 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-28 | Record vote | |
2009-04-28 | Passed | |
2009-04-28 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-28 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-28 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-28 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-04-24 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-04-15 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-04-14 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-14 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-08 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-08 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-04-08 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-08 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-08 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-11 | Referred to Land & Resource Management | |
2009-03-11 | Read first time | |
2009-03-04 | Filed |