TX HB2417 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-21 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-21 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to incentives for media production facilities in this state.
Title
Relating to incentives for media production facilities in this state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-20 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-15 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-12 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-12 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-12 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-12 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-16 | House | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism |
2021-03-16 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB2418 (Same As) 2021-03-16 - Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism