TX HB2416 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-06 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-06 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the administration by the Texas Workforce Commission of a workforce diploma pilot program.
Title
Relating to the administration by the Texas Workforce Commission of a workforce diploma pilot program.
Sponsors
Rep. John Frullo [R] | Rep. Oscar Longoria [D] | Sen. Cesar Blanco [D] | Rep. John Raney [R] |
Rep. Toni Rose [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2019-05-06 | House | Companion considered in lieu of SB 1055 |
2019-05-01 | House | Postponed 5/6/19 10:00 AM |
2019-05-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-29 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to International Relations & Economic Development |
2019-03-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1055 (Same As) 2019-05-22 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
ADULT EDUCATION
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Vocational
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
TECHNICAL EDUCATION
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Vocational
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
TECHNICAL EDUCATION
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS