TX HB2403 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a study concerning maternal mortality and morbidity in the state's African American population.
Title
Relating to a study concerning maternal mortality and morbidity in the state's African American population.
Sponsors
Rep. Shawn Thierry [D] | Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D] | Rep. Eric Johnson [D] | Rep. Garnet Coleman [D] |
Rep. Armando Walle [D] | Rep. Ron Reynolds [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | House | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. |
2017-05-12 | House | Withdrawn from calendar |
2017-05-12 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-11 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-05-09 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-05-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-04 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-04 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-05-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-02 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-02 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-05-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-02 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-22 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2017-03-22 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-24 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
MATERNAL MORTALITY & MORBIDITY TASK FORCE
PREGNANCY & CHILDBIRTH
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Women
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
MATERNAL MORTALITY & MORBIDITY TASK FORCE
PREGNANCY & CHILDBIRTH
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Women