TX HB2400 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-25 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-25 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to photo identification for certain debit or credit card transactions.
Title
Relating to photo identification for certain debit or credit card transactions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-25 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2023-04-21 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-21 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-13 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-04-13 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2023-04-13 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-05 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-05 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services |
2023-03-09 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-16 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB761 (Same As) 2023-05-19 - Effective immediately
HB2405 (Same As) 2023-03-13 - Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
SB761 (Same As) 2023-05-19 - Effective immediately
HB2405 (Same As) 2023-03-13 - Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
SB761 (Same As) 2023-05-19 - Effective immediately