TX HB2381 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-06 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-06 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the maximum judgment amount awarded by a justice court in certain civil cases regarding the repair of residential rental property.
Title
Relating to the maximum judgment amount awarded by a justice court in certain civil cases regarding the repair of residential rental property.
Sponsors
Rep. Cody Vasut [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-06 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2023-05-06 | House | Companion considered in lieu of SB 1259 |
2023-05-06 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2023-05-03 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2023-04-28 | House | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. |
2023-04-28 | House | Withdrawn from calendar (by author) |
2023-04-28 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2023-04-25 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2023-04-12 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2023-04-10 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-10 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-03-27 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-03-27 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2023-03-27 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-03-22 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-22 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2023-03-09 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-15 | House | Filed |