TX HB238 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-24 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-24 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the regulation of migrant labor housing facilities; changing the amount of a civil penalty.
Title
Relating to the regulation of migrant labor housing facilities; changing the amount of a civil penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-27 - House - Read 3rd time RV#634 (Y: 102 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - Amended RV#582 (Y: 116 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - Amended RV#582 (Y: 116 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-24 | Senate | Removed from local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-04-27 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-27 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-27 | House | Record vote RV#634 |
2023-04-27 | House | Passed |
2023-04-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-26 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-26 | House | Record vote RV#582 |
2023-04-26 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2023-04-26 | House | Amended 1-Romero |
2023-04-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-26 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-04-20 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-11 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-28 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-28 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-28 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-28 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-02-23 | House | Referred to Urban Affairs |
2023-02-23 | House | Read first time |
2022-11-14 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Housing
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Housing--General
Labor
Labor--Agricultural Workers
Labor--Health & Safety
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Housing--General
Labor
Labor--Agricultural Workers
Labor--Health & Safety