TX HB2367 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 29 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 29 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of an advisory panel to study certain parental rights relating to possession of or access to the parent's child.
Title
Relating to the creation of an advisory panel to study certain parental rights relating to possession of or access to the parent's child.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective immediately | |
2011-06-17 | Filed without the Governor's signature | |
2011-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-30 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-29 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-27 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported | |
2011-05-27 | Text of Senate Amendment(s) | |
2011-05-27 | Record vote | |
2011-05-27 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) | |
2011-05-24 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2011-05-24 | Senate Amendments distributed | |
2011-05-24 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-24 | Record vote | |
2011-05-24 | Passed | |
2011-05-24 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-24 | Record vote | |
2011-05-24 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-24 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2011-05-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-24 | Amended | |
2011-05-24 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-24 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-24 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-05-24 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-21 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-21 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-21 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-05-20 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-20 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-09 | Referred to Jurisprudence | |
2011-05-09 | Read first time | |
2011-05-06 | Received from the House | |
2011-05-06 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-05 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-05 | Record vote | |
2011-05-05 | Passed | |
2011-05-05 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-05 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-05 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2011-05-05 | Amended | |
2011-05-05 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-05 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-03 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-04-21 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-04-20 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-20 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-14 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-14 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-04-14 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-11 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-11 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-11 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-11 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | |
2011-03-10 | Read first time | |
2011-03-07 | Filed |
Subjects
Family
Family--Child Protection
Family--Parent & Child
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
PARENTAL RIGHTS
PARENTAL RIGHTS ADVISORY PANEL
Family--Child Protection
Family--Parent & Child
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
PARENTAL RIGHTS
PARENTAL RIGHTS ADVISORY PANEL