TX HB2359 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to direct campaign expenditures.
Title
Relating to direct campaign expenditures.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective immediately | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-26 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-25 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-24 | Senate passage reported | |
2011-05-24 | Record vote | |
2011-05-24 | Passed | |
2011-05-24 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-24 | Record vote | |
2011-05-24 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-24 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-24 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-24 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-17 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-17 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-17 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-05-16 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-16 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-12 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2011-05-12 | Read first time | |
2011-05-12 | Received from the House | |
2011-05-12 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-11 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-11 | Record vote | |
2011-05-11 | Passed | |
2011-05-11 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-10 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-10 | Record vote | |
2011-05-10 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-05-10 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-06 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-05-04 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-05-03 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-02 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-02 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-18 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-18 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-11 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-11 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-11 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-11 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Elections | |
2011-03-10 | Read first time | |
2011-03-07 | Filed |
Subjects
Corporations & Associations
Elections
Elections--Campaign Financing
ETHICS COMMISSION, TEXAS
Labor
Labor--Management Relations
POLITICAL CONTRIBUTIONS
Elections
Elections--Campaign Financing
ETHICS COMMISSION, TEXAS
Labor
Labor--Management Relations
POLITICAL CONTRIBUTIONS