TX HB2351 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-24 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-24 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the investigation of fire fighters employed by certain municipalities.
Title
Relating to the investigation of fire fighters employed by certain municipalities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#603 (Y: 140 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-24 | Senate | Removed from local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-02 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-02 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed |
2017-05-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-01 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-05-01 | House | Amended |
2017-05-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-01 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-28 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-27 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-27 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-18 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-16 | House | Referred to Urban Affairs |
2017-03-16 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-23 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Employees/Officers
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
City Government--Employees/Officers
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General