TX HB2330 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to information and services for foster children who are pregnant or minor parents.
Title
Relating to information and services for foster children who are pregnant or minor parents.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-27 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-24 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-24 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-24 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-20 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2017-03-20 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-23 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Parent & Child
FOSTER CARE
Human Services
Human Services--Child Services
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
PREGNANCY & CHILDBIRTH
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Parent & Child
FOSTER CARE
Human Services
Human Services--Child Services
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
PREGNANCY & CHILDBIRTH