TX HB233 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 12 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the scheduling of the first day of school for students by school districts and open-enrollment charter schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the scheduling of the first day of school for students by school districts and open-enrollment charter schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-06 - House - Failed to pass to engrossment RV#1021 (Y: 41 N: 99 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-06HouseRecord vote RV#1021
2019-05-06HouseFailed to pass to engrossment
2019-05-06HouseAmended 3-Ashby
2019-05-06HouseAmended 2-Springer, et al.
2019-05-06HouseMotion to table fails 2-Springer, et al.
2019-05-06HousePoint of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2
2019-05-06HousePoint of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 3
2019-05-06HouseAmendment(s) offered 2-Springer, Dean, Ashby, Lang, Phelan, Clardy, Guillen, Frank, Price, K. Bell, Bailes, Hefner, More
2019-05-06HouseAmendment withdrawn 1-K. King
2019-05-06HousePoint of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2, and Rule 8, Section 10(b)
2019-05-06HouseAmendment(s) offered 1-K. King
2019-05-06HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-01HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-29HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-18HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-18HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-11HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-11HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-11HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-13HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-13HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-13HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-13HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-19HouseReferred to Public Education
2019-02-19HouseRead first time
2018-11-12HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB673 (Same As) 2019-03-01 - Referred to Education

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback