TX HB2327 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the establishment and operation of a motor-bus-only lane pilot program in certain counties.
Title
Relating to the establishment and operation of a motor-bus-only lane pilot program in certain counties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Vetoed by the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-30 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-30 | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2011-05-30 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-29 | Record vote | |
2011-05-29 | House adopts conference committee report | |
2011-05-29 | House adopts resolution to go outside bounds | |
2011-05-29 | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2011-05-29 | Record vote | |
2011-05-29 | Senate adopts conference committee report | |
2011-05-29 | Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds | |
2011-05-28 | Conf. Comm. Report distributed | |
2011-05-28 | Conference committee report filed | |
2011-05-28 | Senate appoints conferees-reported | |
2011-05-28 | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported | |
2011-05-28 | Senate appoints conferees | |
2011-05-28 | Senate grants request for conference comm. | |
2011-05-27 | House appoints conferees-reported | |
2011-05-27 | House requests conference committee-reported | |
2011-05-27 | House refuses to concur-reported | |
2011-05-27 | House appoints conferees | |
2011-05-27 | House requests conference committee | |
2011-05-27 | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments | |
2011-05-27 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-27 | Record vote | |
2011-05-27 | Motion fails | |
2011-05-27 | Motion to concur in Senate amendment(s) | |
2011-05-26 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2011-05-26 | Senate Amendments distributed | |
2011-05-25 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | Passed | |
2011-05-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2011-05-25 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-25 | Amended | |
2011-05-25 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-25 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-05-23 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-20 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-20 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-18 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-04 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-04 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-04 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-28 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | |
2011-04-28 | Read first time | |
2011-04-27 | Received from the House | |
2011-04-27 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-26 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-26 | Record vote | |
2011-04-26 | Passed | |
2011-04-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-26 | Record vote | |
2011-04-26 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-26 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-26 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-26 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-26 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-04-21 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-04-20 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-04-19 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-19 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-13 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-13 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-04-13 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-06 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-06 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-06 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Transportation | |
2011-03-10 | Read first time | |
2011-03-04 | Filed |
Subjects
Highways
HOV & EXCLUSIVE LANES
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Transportation
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Transportation--Mass Transit
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road
HOV & EXCLUSIVE LANES
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Transportation
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Transportation--Mass Transit
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road