TX HB2326 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the continuation of a health care provider participation program by the Dallas County Hospital District.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the continuation of a health care provider participation program by the Dallas County Hospital District.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#254 (Y: 126 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Read 2nd time RV#229 (Y: 128 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-05-24 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-14 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-14SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-13HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-10HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-10HouseSenate passage reported
2019-05-10SenateRecord vote
2019-05-10SenatePassed
2019-05-10SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-10SenateRecord vote
2019-05-10SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-10SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-10SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-10SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-10SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-03SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-03SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-03SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-01SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-01SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-15SenateReferred to Administration
2019-04-15SenateRead first time
2019-04-11SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-10HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-10HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-10HouseRecord vote RV#254
2019-04-10HousePassed
2019-04-10HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-09HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-09HouseRecord vote RV#229
2019-04-09HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-09HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-09HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-05HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-03HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-02HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-02HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-26HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-03-26HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-14HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-14HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-14HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-13HousePosting rule suspended
2019-03-06HouseReferred to County Affairs
2019-03-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-25HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1060 (Same As) 2019-04-03 - Committee report printed and distributed

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback