TX HB2323 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-02 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-02 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the extension of an emergency order for protective services for certain persons who are elderly or have disabilities.
Title
Relating to the extension of an emergency order for protective services for certain persons who are elderly or have disabilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2013-05-02 | House | Companion considered in lieu of |
2013-05-02 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2013-05-01 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-04-24 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-23 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-04-23 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-04-23 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-23 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-11 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2013-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Aging
Disabilities, Persons with
ELDER ABUSE
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Human Services
Human Services--General
PROTECTIVE ORDERS
Disabilities, Persons with
ELDER ABUSE
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Human Services
Human Services--General
PROTECTIVE ORDERS
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=83R&Bill=HB2323 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/83R/billtext/html/HB02323I.htm |