TX HB2319 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-03 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-03 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain coordinated county transportation authorities.
Title
Relating to certain coordinated county transportation authorities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2019-05-03 | House | Companion considered in lieu of SB 1066 |
2019-05-03 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-04-30 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-04-18 | House | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. |
2019-04-18 | House | Withdrawn from calendar (by author) |
2019-04-18 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-04-15 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-04-09 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-26 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-26 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-03-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2019-03-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1066 (Same As) 2019-05-20 - Effective immediately
Subjects
City Government
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Transportation
Transportation--Mass Transit
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Transportation
Transportation--Mass Transit