TX HB2310 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-29 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-29 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to electronic requests made to certain local governments for information under or regarding the open records law.
Title
Relating to electronic requests made to certain local governments for information under or regarding the open records law.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Leach [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-29 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-22 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-22 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-04-22 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-17 | House | Referred to Government Transparency & Operation |
2015-03-17 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-04 | House | Filed |