TX HB2309 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-14 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-14 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the sale of dogs or cats by a roadside vendor in certain counties.
Title
Relating to the sale of dogs or cats by a roadside vendor in certain counties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-14 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-14 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-13 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-07 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-07 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-05-07 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-23 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-23 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-23 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2015-03-17 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2015-03-17 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-04 | House | Filed |