TX HB2302 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-29 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-29 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of the criminal offense of a peace officer making a false statement in an incident report.
Title
Relating to the creation of the criminal offense of a peace officer making a false statement in an incident report.
Sponsors
Rep. James White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-23 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-23 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2021-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-25 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Law Enforcement
PEACE OFFICERS
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Law Enforcement
PEACE OFFICERS