TX HB2296 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the delivery of alcoholic beverages by the holder of a wine and beer retailer's permit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the delivery of alcoholic beverages by the holder of a wine and beer retailer's permit.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-08HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-08HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-05HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-02HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-02HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-02HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-26HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-26HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-26HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-26HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-26HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-06HouseReferred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
2019-03-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-25HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1232 (Same As) 2019-06-04 - Effective on 9/1/19

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback