TX HB2293 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-10 - Effective on 1/1/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-10 - Effective on 1/1/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the certification by the comptroller to the commissioner of education of the taxable value of property in each school district.
Title
Relating to the certification by the comptroller to the commissioner of education of the taxable value of property in each school district.
Sponsors
Rep. Drew Darby [R] | Sen. Royce West [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-05 - House - HB 2293Third Reading House (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-10 | Effective on 1/1/16 | |
2015-06-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-22 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-21 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-20 | House | Senate passage reported |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-05 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-05 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed |
2015-05-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-04 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-05-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-04 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-04-28 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-20 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-20 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-14 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-14 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-14 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-17 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2015-03-17 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--School District
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--School District