TX HB2289 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-08 - Reported favorably as substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-08 - Reported favorably as substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the security of the electric grid.
Title
Relating to the security of the electric grid.
Sponsors
Sen. Tan Parker [R] | Rep. Matt Schaefer [R] | Rep. John Wray [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-08 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-05-08 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-22 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-22 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-22 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-13 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2015-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
ELECTRIC GRID SECURITY ADVISORY COMMITTEE
Electronic Information Systems
Governor
Legislature
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
Safety
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Utilities
Utilities--Electric
Electronic Information Systems
Governor
Legislature
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
Safety
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Utilities
Utilities--Electric
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=HB2289 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/HB02289I.htm |