TX HB2283 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the acceptance of certain gifts and donations for the administration of elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the acceptance of certain gifts and donations for the administration of elections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-28 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1633 (Y: 96 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#529 (Y: 89 N: 52 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#528 (Y: 66 N: 80 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-04-28 - House - Amended RV#514 (Y: 81 N: 61 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-18 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-18 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-31 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-30HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-30HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-28SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-28HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2021-05-28HouseRecord vote RV#1633
2021-05-28HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2021-05-27HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2021-05-27HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2021-05-27HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2021-05-25SenateRecord vote
2021-05-25SenatePassed
2021-05-25SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-25SenateRecord vote
2021-05-25SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-24SenateRecord vote
2021-05-24SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-24SenateAmended
2021-05-24SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Hughes
2021-05-24SenateRead 2nd time
2021-05-24SenateRecord vote
2021-05-24SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-24SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-20SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-17SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-17SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-10SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-05-10SenateRead first time
2021-05-03SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-29HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-29HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-29HouseRecord vote RV#529
2021-04-29HousePassed as amended
2021-04-29HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-29HouseRecord vote RV#528
2021-04-29HouseAmendment fails of adoption 3-Anchia
2021-04-29HouseAmended 2-Bucy and Romero
2021-04-29HouseAmended 1-Collier
2021-04-29HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-28HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-28HouseRecord vote RV#514
2021-04-28HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-04-28HouseAmended 1-P. King
2021-04-28HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-28HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-26HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-20HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-19HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-19HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-14HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-14HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-14HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-08HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-08HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-08HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-08HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-15HouseReferred to Elections
2021-03-15HouseRead first time
2021-02-25HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2283
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02283I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02283H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02283E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02283S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02283F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB02283H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB02283H31.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB02283H32.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB02283H33.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB02283S2F1.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02283I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02283H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02283H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02283E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02283E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02283S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB02283S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB02283F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2283&RcdVtNo=514&Ch=H&Dt=04/28/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2283&RcdVtNo=528&Ch=H&Dt=04/29/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2283&RcdVtNo=529&Ch=H&Dt=04/29/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-24-F.PDF#page=84
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-24-F.PDF#page=85
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-25-F.PDF#page=146
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-25-F.PDF#page=147
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2283&RcdVtNo=1633&Ch=H&Dt=05/28/2021

Bill Comments 750

feedback