TX HB2279 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-14 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-14 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to child and adolescent interaction education and training for certain peace and reserve law enforcement officers.
Title
Relating to child and adolescent interaction education and training for certain peace and reserve law enforcement officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-14 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-12 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-07 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-28 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-28 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-28 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-28 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2015-03-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-17 | House | Referred to Emerging Issues In Texas Law Enforcement, Select |
2015-03-17 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Discipline
Law Enforcement
LAW ENFORCEMENT, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PEACE OFFICERS
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Discipline
Law Enforcement
LAW ENFORCEMENT, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PEACE OFFICERS
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING